Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 19-251
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 19-251
Title:Americans for Prosperity Foundation, Petitioner
v.
Rob Bonta, Attorney General of California
Docketed:August 26, 2019
Linked with 18A1224, 20A148
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(16-55727, 16-55786)
   Decision Date:September 11, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:March 29, 2019
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
May 28 2019Application (18A1224) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from June 27, 2019 to August 26, 2019, submitted to Justice Kagan.
Main DocumentProof of Service
May 28 2019Application (18A1224) granted by Justice Kagan extending the time to file until August 26, 2019.
Aug 26 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due September 25, 2019)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 06 2019Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, Americans for Prosperity Foundation.
Blanket Consent
Sep 09 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from September 25, 2019 to October 25, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Sep 11 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including October 25, 2019.
Sep 24 2019Brief amicus curiae of Pacific Legal Foundation filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 24 2019Brief amicus curiae of Liberty Justice Center filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 24 2019Brief amicus curiae of Institute for Justice filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 25 2019Brief amici curiae of Pacific Research Institute, Project for Privacy and Surveillance Accountability filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 25 2019Brief amicus curiae of Proposition 8 Legal Defense Fund filed. VIDED
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 25 2019Brief amicus curiae of The Buckeye Institute filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 25 2019Brief amicus curiae of American Center for Law and Justice filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 25 2019Brief amici curiae of Public Interest Legal Foundation, Center for Constitutional Jurisprudence, Foundation for Michigan Freedom and Texas Public Policy Foundation filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 25 2019Brief amicus curiae of The National Association of Manufacturers filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Sep 25 2019Brief amicus curiae of New Civil Liberties Alliance filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 25 2019Brief amicus curiae of Hispanic Leadership Fund filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 25 2019Brief amici curiae of Cato Institute, et al. filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 25 2019Brief amici curiae of Philanthropy Roundtable, et al. filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 25 2019Brief amici curiae of 24 Family Policy Organizations filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 25 2019Brief amici curiae of The Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America, et al. filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 25 2019Brief amicus curiae of Council on American-Islamic Relations filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 25 2019Brief amicus curiae of Public Integrity Alliance filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 25 2019Brief amicus curiae of Judicial Watch, Inc. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 25 2019Brief amici curiae of States of Arizona et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 25 2019Brief amicus curiae of American Target Advertising, Inc. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 25 2019Brief amicus curiae of Institute for Free Speech filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 25 2019Brief amici curiae of Free Speech Coalition, et al. filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 03 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from October 25, 2019 to November 25, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Oct 07 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including November 25, 2019.
Nov 25 2019Brief of respondent Xavier Becerra, in his official capacity as the Attorney General of California in opposition filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 10 2019Reply of petitioner Americans for Prosperity Foundation filed.
Certificate of Word CountProof of ServiceMain Document
Dec 11 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/10/2020.
Jan 13 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/17/2020.
Jan 21 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/24/2020.
Feb 14 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/21/2020.
Feb 24 2020The Solicitor General is invited to file a brief in this case expressing the views of the United States.
Nov 24 2020Brief amicus curiae of United States filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Dec 09 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/8/2021.
Dec 09 2020Supplemental brief of respondent Xavier Becerra, in his official capacity as the Attorney General of California filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jan 08 2021Petition GRANTED. The petition for a writ of certiorari in No. 19-255 is granted. The cases are consolidated, and a total of one hour is allotted for oral argument. VIDED.
Jan 08 2021Because the Court has consolidated these cases for briefing and oral argument, future filings and activity in the cases will now be reflected on the docket of No. 19-251. Subsequent filings in these cases must therefore be submitted through the electronic filing system in No. 19-251. Each document submitted in connection with one or more of these cases must include on its cover the case number and caption for each case in which the filing is intended to be submitted. Where a filing is submitted in fewer than all of the cases, the docket entry will reflect the case number(s) in which the filing is submitted; a document filed in all of the consolidated cases will be noted as “VIDED.”
Jan 29 2021Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, Thomas More Law Center (in 19-255).
Blanket Consent
Feb 05 2021Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, Americans for Prosperity Foundation
Blanket Consent
Feb 22 2021Brief of petitioner Thomas More Law Center filed (in 19-255).
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 22 2021Joint appendix filed (in 19-255).
Main DocumentProof of Service
Feb 22 2021Brief of petitioner Americans for Prosperity Foundation filed (in 19-251).
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 22 2021Joint appendix filed (in 19-251). (Statement of costs filed)
Main DocumentProof of Service
Feb 23 2021Brief amicus curiae of James Madison Center for Free Speech filed. VIDED
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 24 2021Brief amicus curiae of Council on American-Islamic Relations filed (in 19-251).
Proof of ServiceMain DocumentCertificate of Word Count
Feb 24 2021Brief amici curiae of Pacific Legal Foundation, Southeastern Legal Foundation, and Center for Constitutional Jurisprudence filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 24 2021Brief amicus curiae of Goldwater Institute and Rio Grande Foundation filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 25 2021Brief amici curiae of Concerned Women for America, et al. filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 26 2021Brief amici curiae of National Taxpayers Union Foundation, et al. filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 26 2021Brief amicus curiae of Randy Elf filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 26 2021Brief amici curiae of Public Interest Legal Foundation and Foundation for Michigan Freedom filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 26 2021Brief amicus curiae of American Target Advertising, Inc. filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 01 2021Amicus brief of Philanthropy Roundtable, Independent Women's Forum, and People United for Privacy Foundation not accepted for filing. (March 02, 2021 - corrected brief to be submitted.)
Mar 01 2021Brief amicus curiae of Philanthropy Roundtable filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 01 2021Amicus brief of The Electronic Frontier Foundation, et al. not accepted for filing. (March 02, 2021) (efiling will be resubmitted)
Mar 01 2021Brief amicus curiae of Center for Equal Opportunity filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 01 2021Brief amicus curiae of Citizen Power Initiatives for China filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 01 2021Brief amici curiae of Judicial Watch, Inc., et al. filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 01 2021Brief amicus curiae of The American Legislative Exchange Council filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 01 2021Brief amicus curiae of The Floyd Abrams Institute for Freedom of Expression at Yale Law School in support of neither party filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Mar 01 2021Brief amici curiae of The Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America, et al. filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 01 2021Brief amicus curiae of Institute for Free Speech filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 01 2021Brief amici curiae of Association of National Advertisers (ANA) and the ANA Non-Profit Federation filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 01 2021Brief amici curiae of Hispanic Leadership Fund, et al. filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 01 2021Brief amicus curiae of Proposition 8 Legal Defense Fund filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 01 2021Brief amicus curiae of New Civil Liberties Alliance filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 01 2021Brief amicus curiae of American Center for Law and Justice filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 01 2021Brief amicus curiae of Liberty Justice Center filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Mar 01 2021Brief amici curiae of American Civil Liberties Union, Inc., et al. filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 01 2021Brief amici curiae of Free Speech Coalition, et al. filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 01 2021Brief amicus curiae of The Legacy Foundation filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 01 2021Brief amicus curiae of Independent Women's Law Center filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 01 2021Brief amici curiae of The Nonprofit Alliance Foundation, et al. filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 01 2021Brief amicus curiae of China Aid Association filed. VIDED
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Mar 01 2021Brief amicus curiae of Thomas More Society filed. VIDED
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 01 2021Brief amici curiae of State of Arizona, et al. filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 01 2021Brief amicus curiae of The Becket Fund for Religious Liberty filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 01 2021Brief amici curiae of Congressman John Sarbanes and Democracy 21 in support of neither party filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 01 2021Brief amici curiae of Protect The 1st and Pacific Research Institute filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 01 2021Brief amicus curiae of United States supporting vacatur and remand filed. VIDED.
Proof of ServiceMain Document
Mar 01 2021Brief amici curiae of The Electronic Frontier Foundation, et al. filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 01 2021Brief amici curiae of Citizens United and Citizens United Foundation filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 01 2021Brief amicus curiae of Institute for Justice filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Mar 01 2021Brief amici curiae of The National Association of Manufacturers, et al. filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 01 2021Brief amicus curiae of Senator Mitch McConnell filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 01 2021Brief amici curiae of Cato Institute, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 01 2021Brief amicus curiae of Freedom Foundation filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 01 2021Brief amici curiae of The Buckeye Institute, et al. filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Mar 09 2021Application (20A148) to file respondent's consolidated brief on the merits in excess of the word limit, submitted to Justice Kagan. VIDED.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Mar 11 2021Motion for divided argument and enlargement of time for oral argument filed by petitioners. VIDED.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Mar 12 2021SET FOR ARGUMENT on Monday, April 26, 2021. VIDED.
Mar 12 2021Application (20A148) granted by Justice Kagan to file respondent's consolidated brief on the merits in excess of the word limit. The brief may not exceed 15,000 words. VIDED.
Mar 12 2021Motion of the Acting Solicitor General for leave to participate in oral argument as amicus curiae and for divided argument filed. VIDED.
Proof of ServiceMain Document
Mar 15 2021Record requested.
Mar 15 2021The record from the U.S.C.A. 9th Circuit is electronic and located on Pacer.
Mar 24 2021Brief of Matthew Rodriquez, Acting Attorney General of California not accepted for filing. (Corrected and reprinted brief submitted - March 25, 2021)
Mar 24 2021Brief of respondent Matthew Rodriquez, Acting Attorney General of California filed (Mar. 25, 2021). VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 30 2021CIRCULATED
Mar 30 2021Brief amicus curiae of The California Association of Nonprofits filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 31 2021Brief amici curiae of States of New York, et al. filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 31 2021Brief amicus curiae of CharityWatch filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Mar 31 2021Brief amici curiae of Scholars of the Law of Non-Profit Organizations filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 31 2021Brief amici curiae of Public Citizen and Public Citizen Foundation filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountCertificate of Word Count
Mar 31 2021Brief amici curiae of U.S. Senators filed (in 19-251). (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 31 2021Amicus brief of Legal Historians not accepted for filing. (April 06, 2021 - Corrected brief submitted.)
Mar 31 2021Brief amici curiae of Legal Historians filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 31 2021Brief amicus curiae of National Council of Nonprofits filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Mar 31 2021Amicus brief of Campaign Legal Center, et al. not accepted for filing. (Corrected brief submitted)
Mar 31 2021Brief amici curiae of Campaign Legal Center, et al. filed. VIDED. (April 17, 2021). (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Apr 05 2021Motion of petitioners for divided argument is DENIED; motion of petitioners for enlargement of time for oral argument is GRANTED, and the time is allotted as follows: 30 minutes for petitioners, 10 minutes for the Acting Solicitor General, and 30 minutes for respondent.
Apr 05 2021Motion of the Acting Solicitor General for leave to participate in oral argument as amicus curiae and for divided argument GRANTED.
Apr 16 2021Reply of petitioner Americans for Prosperity Foundation filed (in 19-251). (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 17 2021Motion to file the reply brief out of time filed by petitioner Thomas More Law Center (in 19-255). (Distributed)
OtherMain DocumentProof of ServiceOtherProof of Service
Apr 24 2021Motion of Thomas More Law Center to file a reply brief out of time GRANTED.
Apr 26 2021Argued. For petitioners: Derek L. Shaffer, Washington, D. C. For United States, as amicus curiae: Elizabeth B. Prelogar, Acting Solicitor General, Department of Justice, Washington, D. C. For respondent: Aimee A. Feinberg, Deputy Solicitor General, Sacramento, Cal. VIDED.
Jul 01 2021Judgment REVERSED and case REMANDED. Roberts, C. J., delivered the opinion of the Court, except as to Part II– B–1. Kavanaugh and Barrett, JJ., joined that opinion in full, Alito and Gorsuch, JJ., joined except as to Part II–B–1, and Thomas, J., joined except as to Parts II–B–1 and III–B. Thomas, J., filed an opinion concurring in part and concurring in the judgment. Alito, J., filed an opinion concurring in part and concurring in the judgment, in which Gorsuch, J., joined. Sotomayor, J., filed a dissenting opinion, in which Breyer and Kagan, JJ., joined. VIDED.
Aug 02 2021JUDGMENT ISSUED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
John J. Bursch
    Counsel of Record
Alliance Defending Freedom
440 First Street NW
Suite 600
Washington, DC 20001

jbursch@adflegal.org
(616) 450-4235
Party name: Thomas More Law Center
Derek L. Shaffer
    Counsel of Record
Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP
1300 I Street NW, Suite 900
Washington, DC 20005

derekshaffer@quinnemanuel.com
(202) 538-8000
Party name: Americans for Prosperity Foundation
Attorneys for Respondent
Aimee Athena Feinberg
    Counsel of Record
California Department of Justice
1300 I Street
Sacramento, CA 95814

Aimee.Feinberg@doj.ca.gov
916-210-6003
Party name: Rob Bonta, Attorney General of California
Other
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Acting Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States
James Gideon Abernathy
    Counsel of Record
Freedom Foundation
PO Box 552
Olympia, WA 98507

JAbernathy@freedomfoundation.com
3609563482
Party name: Freedom Foundation
Floyd Abrams
    Counsel of Record
32 Old Slip
New York, NY 10005

fabrams@cahill.com
212-701-3621
Party name: The Floyd Abrams Institute for Freedom of Expression at Yale Law School
Robert Daniel AltThe Buckeye lnstitute
88 E. Broad Street, Suite 1300
Columbus, OH 43215

robert@buckeyeinstitute.org
614-224-4422
Party name: The Buckeye Institute
Eric S. Baxter
    Counsel of Record
The Becket Fund for Religious Liberty
1919 Pennsylvania Ave. NW
Suite 400
Washington, DC 20006

ebaxter@becketlaw.org
202-955-0095
Party name: The Becket Fund for Religious Liberty
Lisa Schiavo Blatt
    Counsel of Record
Williams & Connolly LLP
725 12th Street, NW
Washington, DC 20005

lblatt@wc.com
202-434-5050
Party name: Institute for Free Speech
James Bopp Jr.
    Counsel of Record
The Bopp Law Firm, PC
The National Building
1 South Sixth Street
Terre Haute, IN 47807

jboppjr@aol.com
8122322434
Party name: James Madison Center for Free Speech
Thomas L. Brejcha
    Counsel of Record
Thomas More Society
309 West Washington Street, Suite 1250
Chicago, IL 60606

tbrejcha@thomasmoresociety.org
3127821680
Party name: Thomas More Society
Brian Timothy Burgess
    Counsel of Record
Goodwin Procter, LLP
1900 N Street, N.W.
Washington, DC 20036

BBurgess@goodwinlaw.com
2023464000
Party name: The Electronic Frontier Foundation, et al.
Caleb P. Burns
    Counsel of Record
Wiley Rein LLP
1776 K Street, NW
Washington, DC 20006

cburns@wileyrein.com
202-719-7000
Party name: The Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America and The U.S. Chamber of Commerce Foundation
Jay Randall Carson
    Counsel of Record
The Buckeye Institute
88 East Broad St.
Suite 1300
Columbus, OH 43215

j.carson@buckeyeinstitute.org
614-224-4422
Party name: The Buckeye Institute
Daniel Patrick Chiplock
    Counsel of Record
Lieff Cabraser Heimann & Bernstein, LLP
250 Hudson Street
New York, NY 10013

DCHIPLOCK@lchb.com
(212) 355-9500
Party name: U.S. Senators
Frederick W. Claybrook Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Claybrook, LLC
700 Sixth St., NW, Ste.430
Washington, DC 20001

rick@claybrooklaw.com
202-250-3833
Party name: Concerned Women for America
Rusty Duane Crandell
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Attorney General, State of Arizona
2005 N. Central Avenue
Phoenix, AZ 85004

Rusty.Crandell@azag.gov
6025428540
Party name: States of Arizona et al.
Charles Timothy Delaney
    Counsel of Record
National Council of Nonprofits
1001 G Street NW
Suite 700E
Washington, DC 20001

TDELANEY@COUNCILOFNONPROFITS.ORG
2029620322
Party name: National Council of Nonprofits
Karen Michelle Donnelly
    Counsel of Record
Copilevitz, Lam & Raney, P.C.
310 W. 20th Street, Suite 300
Kansas City, MO 64108

kdonnelly@clrkc.com
816-472-9000
Party name: The Nonprofit Alliance Foundation, People for the Ethical Treatment of Animals, Association of Fundraising Professionals, and 123 Nonprofit Organizations Listed in Appendix as Amici Curiae
Randolph Scott Elf
    Counsel of Record
Post Office Box 525
Lakewood, NY 14750

ForEFilingOnly@gmail.com
2024232122
Party name: Randy Elf
Drew Curtis Ensign
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Attorney General
2005 N. Central Avenue
Phoenix, AZ 85004

drew.ensign@azag.gov
602-542-5025
Party name: State of Arizona
Mark J. Fitzgibbons
    Counsel of Record
American Target Advertising
9625 Surveyor Court
Suite 400
Manassas, VA 20110

mfitzgibbons@americantarget.com
7033927676
Party name: American Target Advertising, Inc.
Lee Elton Goodman
    Counsel of Record
Wiley Rein LLP
1776 K Street NW
Washington, DC 20006

lgoodman@wiley.law
2027197000
Party name: The American Legislative Exchange Council
Jeffrey Matthew Harris
    Counsel of Record
Consovoy McCarthy PLLC
1600 Wilson Blvd.
Suite 700
Arlington, VA 22209

jeff@consovoymccarthy.com
(703) 243-9423
Party name: Hispanic Leadership Fund
Kathleen Roberta Hartnett
    Counsel of Record
Cooley LLP
101 California Street
San Francisco, CA 94111

khartnett@cooley.com
(415) 693-2000
Party name: CharityWatch
Brian M. Hauss
    Counsel of Record
American Civil Liberties Union Foundation
125 Broad Street, 18th Floor
New York, NY 10004

bhauss@aclu.org
2125492500
Party name: American Civil Liberties Union, Inc., et al.
Thomas G. Hungar
    Counsel of Record
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP
1050 Connecticut Avenue NW
Washington, DC 20036

thungar@gibsondunn.com
202-955-8500
Party name: Center for Equal Opportunity
Erik S. Jaffe
    Counsel of Record
Schaerr | Jaffe LLP
1717 K Street, N.W., Suite 900
Washington, DC 20006

ejaffe@schaerr-jaffe.com
202-787-1060
Party name: Protect The 1st and Pacific Research Institute
Erik S. Jaffe
    Counsel of Record
Schaerr | Jaffe LLP
1717 K Street, N.W., Suite 900
Washington, DC 20006

ejaffe@schaerr-jaffe.com
202-415-7412
Party name: Pacific Research Institute, Project for Privacy and Surveillance Accountability
Martin Sander Kaufman
    Counsel of Record
Atlantic Legal Foundation
500 Mamaroneck Avenue
Suite 320
Harrison, NY 10528

mskaufman@atlanticlegal.org
914.472.2356
Party name: The National Association of Manufacturers
Brian Kirk Kelsey
    Counsel of Record
Liberty Justice Center
190 S. LaSalle St., Suite 1500
Chicago, IL 60603

bkelsey@libertyjusticecenter.org
312-263-7668
Party name: Liberty Justice Center
Kory Alan Langhofer
    Counsel of Record
Statecraft PLLC
649 North Fourth Avenue, First Floor
Phoenix, AZ 85003

kory@statecraftlaw.com
6023824078
Party name: Public Integrity Alliance
Margaret Ann Little
    Counsel of Record
New Civil Liberties Alliance
1225 19th St NW
Suite 450
Washington, DC 20036

peggy.little@ncla.onmicrosoft.com
2028695212
Party name: The New Civil Liberties Alliance
Margaret Ann Little
    Counsel of Record
New Civil Liberties Alliance
1225 19th St NW
Suite 450
Washington, DC 20036

peggy.little@ncla.onmicrosoft.com
2028695212
Party name: New Civil Liberties Alliance
Sean Marotta
    Counsel of Record
Hogan Lovells US LLP
555 Thirteenth Street, N.W.
Washington, DC 20004

sean.marotta@hoganlovells.com
2026374881
Party name: The National Association of Manufacturers, the Atlantic Legal Foundation, and National and State Trade Associations
James Christopher Martin
    Counsel of Record
Reed Smith LLP
225 Fifth Avenue
Pittsburgh, PA 15222

jcmartin@reedsmith.com
412.288.3131
Party name: Association of National Advertisers (ANA) and the ANA Non-Profit Federation
Lena Fatina Masri
    Counsel of Record
Council on American-Islamic Relations Legal Defense Fund
453 New Jersey Ave., S.E.
Washington, DC 20003

lmasri@cair.com
12027426420
Party name: Council on American-Islamic Relations
Anna-Rose Mathieson
    Counsel of Record
California Appellate Law Group LLP
96 Jessie Street
San Francisco, CA 94105

annarose.mathieson@calapplaw.com
4156496700
Party name: The California Association of Nonprofits
Donald Francis McGahn II
    Counsel of Record
Jones Day
51 Louisiana Ave., NW
Washington, DC 20001

DMcGahn@jonesday.com
(202) 879-3939
Party name: Senator Mitch McConnell
Anita Yvonne Milanovich
    Counsel of Record
Milanovich Law, PLLC
100 E Broadway Street, The Berkeley Room
Butte, MT 59701

aymilanovich@milanovichlaw.com
4065896856
Party name: 24 Family Policy Organizations
Kasdin Miller Mitchell
    Counsel of Record
Kirkland & Ellis LLP
1301 Pennsylvania Ave. N.W.
Washington, DC 20004

kasdin.mitchell@kirkland.com
2023895165
Party name: Independent Women's Law Center
Jeremiah Lee Morgan
    Counsel of Record
William J. Olson, P.C.
370 Maple Avenue West
Suite 4
Vienna, VA 22180-5615

jmorgan@lawandfreedom.com
7033565070
Party name: Citizens United and Citizens United Foundation
Scott Lawrence Nelson
    Counsel of Record
Public Citizen Litigation Group
1600 20th Street, N.W.
Washington, DC 20009

snelson@citizen.org
202-588-1000
Party name: Public Citizen and Public Citizen Foundation
Andrew C. Nichols
    Counsel of Record
Charis Lex P.C.
4250 N. Fairfax Dr.
Suite 600
Arlington, VA 22203

anichols@charislex.com
571-549-2645
Party name: China Aid Association
William Jeffrey OlsonWilliam J. Olson, P.C.
370 Maple Ave. W., Suite 4
Vienna, VA 22180

wjo@mindspring.com
7033565070
Party name: Free Speech Coalition, et al.
Bradley S. Phillips
    Counsel of Record
Munger, Tolles & Olson, LLP
350 South Grand Avenue
50th Floor
Los Angeles, CA 90071

brad.phillips@mto.com
2136839262
Party name: Scholars of the Law of Non-Profit Organizations
Kaylan Lytle Phillips
    Counsel of Record
Public Interest Legal Foundation
32 E. Washington, Suite 1675
Indianapolis,, IN 46204

kphillips@publicinterestlegal.org
3172035599
Party name: Public Interest Legal Foundation and Foundation for Michigan Freedom
Kaylan Lytle Phillips
    Counsel of Record
Public Interest Legal Foundation
32 E. Washington, Suite 1675
Indianapolis,, IN 46204

kphillips@publicinterestlegal.org
3172035599
Party name: Public Interest Legal Foundation, Center for Constitutional Jurisprudence, Foundation for Michigan Freedom and Texas Public Policy Foundation
Robert D. Popper
    Counsel of Record
Judicial Watch, Inc.
425 Third Street, SW
Washington, DC 20024

rpopper@judicialwatch.org
202-646-5172
Party name: Judicial Watch, Inc.
Andrew P. Pugno
    Counsel of Record
Law Offices of Andrew P. Pugno
8261 Greenback Lane
Suite 200
Fair Oaks, CA 95628-2533

andrew@pugnolaw.com
9166083065
Party name: Proposition 8 Legal Defense Fund
Alexander Lyman Reid
    Counsel of Record
Morgan Lewis & Bockius LLP
1111 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20004

alexander.reid@morganlewis.com
(202) 739-3000
Party name: Philanthropy Roundtable, Independent Women's Forum, and People United for Privacy Foundation
Alexander Lyman Reid
    Counsel of Record
Morgan Lewis & Bockius LLP
1111 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20004

alexander.reid@morganlewis.com
202-739-3000
Party name: Philanthropy Roundtable
Timothy Mason Sandefur
    Counsel of Record
Goldwater Institute
500 E. Coronado Road
Phoenix, AZ 85004

tsandefur@goldwaterinstitute.org
6024625000
Party name: Goldwater Institute and Rio Grande Foundation
Darin Murl Sands
    Counsel of Record
Bradley Bernstein LLP
1425 SW 20th Ave
Suite 201
Portland, OR 97201

dsands@bradleybernsteinllp.com
503-734-2480
Party name: Legal Historians
Jay Alan Sekulow
    Counsel of Record
American Center for Law and Justice
201 Maryland Avenue, N.E.
Washington, DC 20002

sekulow@aclj.org
(757)226-2749
Party name: American Center for Law and Justice
Kelly J. Shackelford
    Counsel of Record
First Liberty Institute
First Liberty Institute, 2001 W Piano Pkwy
Suite 1600
Plano, TX 75075

kshackelford@firstliberty.org
972-941-4444
Party name: Citizen Power Initiatives for China
Ilya Shapiro
    Counsel of Record
Cato Institute
1000 Massachusetts Ave., NW
Washington, DC 20001

ishapiro@cato.org
2028420200
Party name: Cato Institute
Paul Michael Sherman
    Counsel of Record
Institute for Justice
901 North Glebe Road
Suite 900
Arlington, VA 22203

psherman@ij.org
7036829320
Party name: Institute for Justice
Paul March Smith
    Counsel of Record
Campaign Legal Center
1101 14th Street, NW, Suite 400
Washington, DC 20005

psmith@campaignlegalcenter.org
202-736-2200
Party name: Campaign Legal Center, et al.
Jeremy Brennan Talcott
    Counsel of Record
Pacific Legal Foundation
930 G Street
Sacramento, CA 95814

jtalcott@pacificlegal.org
916-419-7111
Party name: Pacific Legal Foundation, Southeastern Legal Foundation, and Center for Constitutional Jurisprudence
Joshua Paul ThompsonPacific Legal Foundation
930 G Street
Sacramento, CA 95814

jthompson@pacificlegal.org
9164197111
Party name: Pacific Legal Foundation
Herbert William Titus
    Counsel of Record
William J. Olson, P.C.
370 Maple Avenue West
Suite 4
Vienna, VA 22180

htitus@cox.net
7033565070
Party name: Free Speech Coalition, et al.
Jason Brett Torchinsky
    Counsel of Record
Holtzman Vogel Josefiak Torchinsky PLLC
15405 John Marshall Highway
Haymarket, VA 20169

Jtorchinsky@hvjt.law
540 341 8808
Party name: The Legacy Foundation
Barbara Dale Underwood
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
Office of the Attorney General
28 Liberty Street
New York, NY 10005-1400

Barbara.underwood@ag.ny.gov
212-416-8016
Party name: States of New York, Colorado, Connecticut, Hawai‘I, Illinois, Maine, Maryland, Massachusetts, Michigan, Nevada, New Jersey, New Mexico, Oregon, Pennsylvania, Rhode Island, and Virginia, and the District of Columbia
Seth P. Waxman
    Counsel of Record
Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale and Dorr LLP
1875 Pennsylvania Ave, NW
Washington, DC 20006

Seth.Waxman@wilmerhale.com
202-663-6000
Party name: Congressman John Sarbanes and Democracy 21
Owen Dennis YeatesInstitute for Free Speech
1150 Connecticut Ave NW
Ste 801
Washington, DC 20036

oyeates@ifs.org
202-301-3300
Party name: Institute for Free Speech
Barnaby W. Zall
    Counsel of Record
Law Office of Barnaby Zall
685 Spring St. #314
Friday Harbor, WA 98250

bzall@aol.com
360-378-6600
Party name: National Taxpayers Union Foundation and the Public Policy Legal Institute

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543