Docket for 18-5296
|
Jul 11 2018 | Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due August 20, 2018) | | Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionAppendixProof of Service | Jul 26 2018 | Waiver of right of respondent United States to respond filed. | | Main Document | Aug 02 2018 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/24/2018. | | | Aug 22 2018 | Response Requested. (Due September 21, 2018) | | | Sep 11 2018 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from September 21, 2018 to October 22, 2018, submitted to The Clerk. | | Main Document | Sep 12 2018 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including October 22, 2018. | | | Oct 19 2018 | Brief of respondent United States in opposition filed. | | Proof of ServiceMain Document | Nov 08 2018 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/30/2018. | | | Dec 03 2018 | Petition DENIED. | | |
|