Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 17-537
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 17-537
Title:Mercury Casualty Company, et al., Petitioners
v.
Dave Jones, California Insurance Commissioner, et al.
Docketed:October 11, 2017
Linked with 17A82
Lower Ct:Court of Appeal of California, Third Appellate District
   Case Numbers:(C077116, C078667)
   Decision Date:February 10, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:May 10, 2017
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Jul 19 2017Application (17A82) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from August 8, 2017 to October 7, 2017, submitted to Justice Kennedy.
Jul 21 2017Application (17A82) granted by Justice Kennedy extending the time to file until October 9, 2017.
Oct 10 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due November 13, 2017)
Nov 07 2017Order extending time to file response to petition to and including January 12, 2018, for all respondents.
Nov 13 2017Brief amici curiae of Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America, California Chamber of Commerce, California Business Roundtable, Washington Legal Foundation, American Consumer Institute filed.
Main DocumentOtherCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 12 2018Brief of respondent Consumer Watchdog, Inc. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 12 2018Brief of respondent California Commissioner of Insurance in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 26 2018Reply of petitioners Mercury Casualty Company, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 31 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/16/2018.
Feb 20 2018Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Neal Kumar Katyal
    Counsel of Record
Hogan Lovells US LLP
555 Thirteenth St., N.W.
Washington, DC 20004

neal.katyal@hoganlovells.com
202-637-5600
Party name: Mercury Casualty Company, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Joshua Aaron Klein
    Counsel of Record
California Department of Justice, 455 Golden Gate Ave., Suite 11000
San Francisco, CA 94102-7004

joshua.klein@doj.ca.gov
(415) 703-2543
Party name: California Commissioner of Insurance
Scott Lawrence Nelson
    Counsel of Record
Public Citizen Litigation Group
1600 20th Street, N.W.
Washington, DC 20009

snelson@citizen.org
202-588-1000
Party name: Consumer Watchdog, Inc.
Other
Kathleen Marie Sullivan
    Counsel of Record
Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP
51 Madison Ave., 22nd Floor
New York, NY 10010

kathleensullivan@quinnemanuel.com
(212) 849-7000
Party name: Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America, California Chamber of Commerce, California Business Roundtable, Washington Legal Foundation, American Consumer Institute

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543