Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 17-1331
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 17-1331
Title:Sody Clements, et al., Petitioners
v.
Southwestern Bell Telephone Company, dba AT&T Oklahoma, et al.
Docketed:March 22, 2018
Lower Ct:Supreme Court of Oklahoma
   Case Numbers:(115,334)
   Decision Date:December 19, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Mar 19 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due April 23, 2018)
Proof of ServiceAppendixPetitionCertificate of Word Count
Apr 03 2018Waiver of right of respondent Southwestern Bell Telephone Co. d/b/a/ AT&T Oklahoma to respond filed.
Main Document
May 01 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/17/2018.
May 21 2018Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Andrew James Waldron
    Counsel of Record
Walker & Walker
511 Couch Dr., 3rd Floor
Oklahoma City, OK 73102

ajwaldron@walkerandwalker.com
(405) 943-9693
Party name: Sody Clements, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Andrew John Pincus
    Counsel of Record
Mayer Brown LLP
1999 K Street, NW
Washington, DC 20006

apincus@mayerbrown.com
202-263-3220
Party name: Southwestern Bell Telephone Co. d/b/a/ AT&T Oklahoma

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543