Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 13-9007
No. 13-9007
Title:
Addie M. Miller, Petitioner
v.
Walt Disney Company Channel 7 KABC, et al.
Docketed:March 7, 2014
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
  Case Nos.:(13-56883)
  Decision Date:December 13, 2013

~~~Date~~~ ~~~~~~~Proceedings  and  Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~
Mar 4 2014 Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due April 7, 2014)
Mar 27 2014 Waiver of right of respondents Walt Disney Company Channel 7 KABC, et al. to respond filed.
Apr 23 2014 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of May 15, 2014.
May 19 2014 Petition DENIED.
Jun 5 2014 Petition for Rehearing filed.
Jun 26 2014 DISTRIBUTED.
Jul 21 2014 Rehearing DENIED.



~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~    ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~   ~~Phone~~~
Attorneys for Petitioner:
Addie M. Miller P.O. Box 79271
Los Angeles, CA  90079
Party name: Addie M. Miller
Attorneys for Respondents:
Karen Nancy Frederiksen The Walt Disney Company(818) 560-1644
    Counsel of Record500 S. Buena Vista Street
Burbank, CA  91521
karen.n.frederiksen@disney.com
Party name: Walt Disney Company Channel 7 KABC, et al.

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543