Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 12-5256
No. 12-5256
Title:
Terri L. Torain, Petitioner
v.
Smithsonian Institution
Docketed:July 17, 2012
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit
  Case Nos.:(2011-3135)
  Decision Date:February 13, 2012

~~~Date~~~ ~~~~~~~Proceedings  and  Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~
May 14 2012 Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due August 16, 2012)
Aug 3 2012 Waiver of right of respondent Smithsonian Institution to respond filed.
Aug 9 2012 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of September 24, 2012.
Oct 1 2012 Petition DENIED.



~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~    ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~   ~~Phone~~~
Attorneys for Petitioner:
Terri L. Torain P.O. Box 14383(301) 943-6260
Silver Spring, MD  20911
Party name: Terri L. Torain
Attorneys for Respondent:
Donald B. Verrilli Jr. Solicitor General(202) 514-2217
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, N.W.
Washington, DC  20530-0001
SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
Party name: Smithsonian Institution

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543