Docket for 24A881
 | | No. 24A881
| Title: | Pamela Bondi, Attorney General, et al., Applicants v. Bryan David Range | Docketed: | March 13, 2025 | | | Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Third Circuit | Case Numbers: | (21-2835) | Decision Date: | | Rehearing Denied: | | Discretionary Court Decision Date: | | | | |
|
Mar 12 2025 | Application (24A881) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from March 23, 2025 to April 22, 2025, submitted to Justice Alito. | | Main DocumentProof of Service | Mar 14 2025 | Application (24A881) granted by Justice Alito extending the time to file until April 22, 2025. | | |
|