Docket for 24A706
|
Jan 15 2025 | Application (24A706) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from February 4, 2025 to March 6, 2025, submitted to Justice Alito. | | Main DocumentProof of Service | Jan 17 2025 | Response to application from respondent Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., as Indenture Trustee filed. | | Main DocumentProof of Service | Jan 21 2025 | Application (24A706) granted by Justice Alito extending the time to file until March 6, 2025. | | | Feb 18 2025 | Application (24A706) to extend further the time from March 6, 2025 to April 5, 2025, submitted to Justice Alito. | | Written RequestProof of Service | Feb 19 2025 | Response to application from respondent Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., as Indenture Trustee filed. | | Main DocumentMain Document | Feb 24 2025 | Application (24A706) granted by Justice Alito extending the time to file until April 5, 2025. | | |
|