Docket for 24A525
|
Nov 22 2024 | Application (24A525) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from December 9, 2024 to January 23, 2025, submitted to Justice Alito. | | Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service | Dec 03 2024 | Application (24A525) granted by Justice Alito extending the time to file until January 8, 2025. | | | Dec 27 2024 | Application (24A525) to extend further the time from January 8, 2025 to February 7, 2025, submitted to Justice Alito. | | Written RequestProof of Service | Jan 02 2025 | Application (24A525) granted by Justice Alito extending the time to file until February 7, 2025. | | |
|