Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 24-997
RSS Feed Print Notify Me
Search documents in this case:
No. 24-997
Title:James Doyle, dba Rocky Mountain Ventures, dba Environmental Land Technologies, Ltd., Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:March 19, 2025
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit
   Case Numbers:(2023-1735)
   Decision Date:December 18, 2024
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Mar 10 2025Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due April 18, 2025)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 17 2025Brief amicus curiae of Mountain States Legal Foundation filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 18 2025Waiver of right of respondent United States to respond filed.
Main Document
Apr 23 2025DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/15/2025.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Richard Shawn Gunnarson
    Counsel of Record
Kirton McConkie
Key Bank Tower
36 South State Street, Suite 1900
Salt Lake City, UT 84111

SGUNNARSON@KMCLAW.COM
801-328-3600
Party name: James Doyle, et al.
Attorneys for Respondent
D. John Sauer
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, D 20530-0001

SUPREMECTBRIEFS@USDOJ.GOV
202-514-2217
Party name: United States
Other
William E. Trachman
    Counsel of Record
Mountain States Legal Foundation
2596 South Lewis Way
Lakewood, CO 80227

wtrachman@mslegal.org
3032922021
Party name: Mountain States Legal Foundation

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543