Docket for 24-992
|
Jan 29 2025 | Application (24A750) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from February 10, 2025 to March 12, 2025, submitted to Justice Gorsuch. | | Main DocumentLower Court Orders/Opinions | Feb 04 2025 | Application (24A750) granted by Justice Gorsuch extending the time to file until March 12, 2025. | | | Mar 12 2025 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due April 17, 2025) | | PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Apr 07 2025 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from April 17, 2025 to May 19, 2025, submitted to The Clerk. | | Main Document | Apr 08 2025 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including May 19, 2025. | | | Apr 17 2025 | Waiver of right of respondent Federal Party to respond filed. | | Main Document | Apr 17 2025 | Brief amicus curiae of Missouri filed. | | Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | Apr 17 2025 | Brief amici curiae of Kansas, et al. filed. | | Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count |
|