Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 24-982
RSS Feed Print Notify Me
Search documents in this case:
No. 24-982
Title:ExxonMobil Corporation, et al., Petitioners
v.
Environment Texas Citizen Lobby, Incorporated, et al.
Docketed:March 13, 2025
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(17-20545)
   Decision Date:December 11, 2024
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Mar 11 2025Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due April 14, 2025)
PetitionAppendixAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 24 2025Waiver of right of respondent Environment TX Citizen Lobby, Inc., et al. to respond filed.
Main Document
Mar 26 2025DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/17/2025.
Apr 09 2025Response Requested. (Due May 9, 2025)
Apr 11 2025Brief amici curiae of Iowa, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Apr 15 2025Motion to extend the time to file a response from May 9, 2025 to June 6, 2025, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Apr 15 2025Response to motion to extend the time to file a response from petitioners filed.
Main Document
Apr 15 2025Reply in support of motion to extend the time to file a response filed by respondents.
Main Document
Apr 16 2025Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted in part and the time is extended to and including June 3, 2025.
Apr 16 2025Brief amici curiae of Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Gregory George Garre
    Counsel of Record
Latham & Watkins LLP
555 Eleventh Street, NW
Suite 1000
Washington, DC 20004

GREGORY.GARRE@LW.COM
202-637-2207
Party name: ExxonMobil Corporation, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
David A. Nicholas
    Counsel of Record
David A. Nicholas
20 Whitney Road
Newton, MA 02460

dnicholas100@gmail.com
617-964-1548
Party name: Environment TX Citizen Lobby, Inc., et al.
Other
Aaron Michael Streett
    Counsel of Record
Baker Botts, L.L.P.
910 Louisiana Street
Houston, TX 77002

AARON.STREETT@BAKERBOTTS.COM
7132291234
Party name: Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America, American Chemistry Council, American Farm Bureau Federation, American Fuel & Petrochemical Manufacturers, National Association of Manufacturers, National Mining Association, Texas Chemical Council, and Texas Oil & Gas Association
Eric Harris Wessan
    Counsel of Record
lowa Attorney General's Office
1305 E Walnut Street
Des Moines, IA 50319

wessan.eric@gmail.com
(515) 823-9117
Party name: Iowa, West Virginia, and 25 Other States

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543