Docket for 24-968
|
Dec 20 2024 | Application (24A633) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from January 7, 2025 to February 6, 2025, submitted to Justice Alito. | | Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service | Dec 27 2024 | Application (24A633) granted by Justice Alito extending the time to file until February 6, 2025. | | | Jan 21 2025 | Application (24A633) to extend further the time from February 6, 2025 to March 8, 2025, submitted to Justice Alito. | | Proof of ServiceWritten Request | Jan 27 2025 | Application (24A633) granted by Justice Alito extending the time to file until March 8, 2025. | | | Mar 07 2025 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due April 10, 2025) | | PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Apr 03 2025 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from April 10, 2025 to May 12, 2025, submitted to The Clerk. | | Main Document | Apr 08 2025 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including May 12, 2025. | | | Apr 22 2025 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from May 12, 2025 to May 27, 2025, submitted to The Clerk. | | Main Document | Apr 24 2025 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including May 27, 2025. | | |
|