Docket for 24-964
|
Mar 05 2025 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due April 7, 2025) | | PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Mar 20 2025 | Waiver of right of respondent Tati King, et al. to respond filed. | | Main Document | Mar 26 2025 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/17/2025. | | | Mar 31 2025 | Response Requested. (Due April 30, 2025) | | | Apr 07 2025 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from April 30, 2025 to May 30, 2025, submitted to The Clerk. | | Main Document | Apr 07 2025 | Brief amici curiae of Texas, et al. filed. | | Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | Apr 08 2025 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including May 30, 2025. | | |
|