Docket for 24-959 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
|
Mar 03 2025 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due April 7, 2025) | | PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Mar 12 2025 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from April 7, 2025 to May 7, 2025, submitted to The Clerk. | | Main Document | Mar 13 2025 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including May 7, 2025. | | |
|