Docket for 24-935
|
Feb 14 2025 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due March 31, 2025) | | PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Mar 13 2025 | Waiver of right of respondent Angelo Brock to respond filed. | | Main Document | Mar 26 2025 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/17/2025. | | | Mar 28 2025 | Response Requested. (Due April 28, 2025) | | | Mar 31 2025 | Brief amici curiae of DRI Center for Law and Public Policy, et al. filed. | | Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Apr 17 2025 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from April 28, 2025 to May 28, 2025, submitted to The Clerk. | | Main Document | Apr 21 2025 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted in part and the time is extended to and including May 27, 2025. | | |
|