Docket for 24-917
|
Feb 21 2025 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due March 27, 2025) | | PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Mar 13 2025 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from March 27, 2025 to April 26, 2025, submitted to The Clerk. | | Main DocumentProof of Service | Mar 14 2025 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including April 28, 2025, for all respondents. | | | Mar 27 2025 | Brief amici curiae of Professor Daniel A. Crane, et al. filed. | | Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | Mar 27 2025 | Brief amici curiae of The Computer & Communications Industry Association, et al. filed. | | Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | Mar 27 2025 | Brief amici curiae of Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America, et al. filed. | | Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | Apr 28 2025 | Brief of respondents NTE Carolinas II, LLC, et al. in opposition filed. | | Main DocumentMain DocumentProof of Service |
|