Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 24-892
RSS Feed Print Notify Me
Search documents in this case:
No. 24-892
Title:Alejandro Martinez, Petitioner
v.
City of Rosenberg, Texas, et al.
Docketed:February 19, 2025
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(23-20539)
   Decision Date:December 11, 2024
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Feb 14 2025Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due March 21, 2025)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 14 2025Waiver of right of respondent City of Rosenberg, Texas, et al. to respond filed.
Main Document
Mar 19 2025DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/4/2025.
Mar 19 2025Brief amicus curiae of Texas Civil Rights Project filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Mar 25 2025Letter to Clerk dated March 14, 2025 from counsel for petitioner received.
Main Document
Mar 26 2025Response Requested. (Due April 25, 2025)
Mar 27 2025Motion to extend the time to file a response from April 25, 2025 to May 27, 2025, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Mar 28 2025Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including May 27, 2025.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Daniel Hirotsu Woofter
    Counsel of Record
Russell & Woofter LLC
1701 Pennsylvania Ave NW
Suite 200
Washington, DC 20006

dw@russellwoofter.com
202-240-8433
Party name: Alejandro Martinez
Attorneys for Respondents
Jacob Charles Cohn
    Counsel of Record
Gordon & Rees Scully Mansukhani, LLP
Three Logan Square
1717 Arch St., Ste 610
Philadelphia, PA 19103

jcohn@grsm.com
2157174004
Party name: City of Rosenberg, Texas, et al.
Other
Daniel Nathan Guisbond
    Counsel of Record
Wheeler Trigg O'Donnell LLP
370 17th Street, Suite 4500
Denver, CO 80202-5647

guisbond@wtotrial.com
3032441800
Party name: The Texas Civil Rights Project

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543