SEARCH TIPS
Search term too short
Invalid text in search term. Try again
ADVANCED SEARCH
DOCKET SEARCH
Search
Toggle navigation
OPINIONS
Opinions of the Court
Opinions Relating to Orders
In-Chambers Opinions
U. S. Reports
Online Sources Cited in Opinions
Media Files Cited in Opinions
Case Citation Finder
FILING & RULES
Electronic Filing
Rules and Guidance
Supreme Court Bar
ORAL ARGUMENTS
Argument Transcripts
Argument Audio
Calendars and Lists
Courtroom Seating
CASE DOCUMENTS
Docket Search
Orders of the Court
Orders by Circuit
Granted/Noted Cases List
Journal
NEWS MEDIA
Services for News Media
Press Releases
Media Advisories
Press Credentials
Speeches
A Reporter's Guide to Applications
Chief Justice's Year-End Reports on the Federal Judiciary
ABOUT
Justices
Supreme Court at Work
Code of Conduct for Justices
History and Traditions
The Supreme Court Building
Building Regulations
Frequently Asked Questions
VISIT
Hours & Directions
Prohibited Items
Visitor Guidelines
Accessibility
Maps & Guides
Courtroom Lectures
Exhibitions
Group Visits
Activities for Students & Families
Café & Building Amenities
Home
>
Search Results
Docket for 24-886
Search documents in this case:
Search
No. 24-886
Title:
Christopher Schurr, Petitioner
v.
Peter Lyoya, Personal Representative for the Estate of Patrick Lyoya, Deceased
Docketed:
February 18, 2025
Lower Ct:
United States Court of Appeals for the Sixth Circuit
Case Numbers:
(23-1887)
Decision Date:
September 9, 2024
Rehearing Denied:
October 21, 2024
Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Date
Proceedings and Orders
Jan 21 2025
Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due March 20, 2025)
Petition
Appendix
Certificate of Word Count
Proof of Service
Mar 20 2025
Waiver of right of respondent Peter Lyoya, Personal Representative for the Estate of Patrick Lyoya (deceased) to respond filed.
Main Document
Mar 20 2025
Brief amicus curiae of National Police Association filed.
Main Document
Proof of Service
Certificate of Word Count
Mar 26 2025
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/17/2025.
Apr 15 2025
Motion of Criminal Defense Attorneys for Petitioner for leave to file amicus brief submitted.
Main Document
Main Document
Certificate of Word Count
Proof of Service
Apr 21 2025
Petition DENIED.
NAME
ADDRESS
PHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Kali May Lester Henderson
Counsel of Record
Seward Henderson PLLC
210 East 3rd Street, Suite 212
Royal Oak, MI 48067
khenderson@sewardhenderson.com
(248) 733-3580
Party name: Christopher Schurr
Attorneys for Respondent
Christopher Patrick Desmond
Counsel of Record
Ven Johnson Law, PLC
535 Griswold Street, Suite 2600
Detroit, MI 48226
CDESMOND@VENJOHNSONLAW.COM
(313) 324-8300
Party name: Peter Lyoya, Personal Representative for the Estate of Patrick Lyoya (deceased)
Other
Mark David Dodge
Counsel of Record
Dodge & Dodge, P.C.
200 Ottawa Ave NW
Suite 401
Grand Rapids, MI 49503
dodgepclaw@gmail.com
6164593850
Party name: Criminal Defense Attorneys for Petitioner
Jeffrey Calvin Hendrickson
Counsel of Record
Pierce Couch Hendrickson Baysinger & Green, L.L.P.
1109 North Francis Avenue
Oklahoma City, OK 73106
jhendrickson@piercecouch.com
405-235-1611
Party name: National Police Association
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##