SEARCH TIPS
Search term too short
Invalid text in search term. Try again
ADVANCED SEARCH
DOCKET SEARCH
Search
Toggle navigation
OPINIONS
Opinions of the Court
Opinions Relating to Orders
In-Chambers Opinions
U. S. Reports
Online Sources Cited in Opinions
Media Files Cited in Opinions
Case Citation Finder
FILING & RULES
Electronic Filing
Rules and Guidance
Supreme Court Bar
ORAL ARGUMENTS
Argument Transcripts
Argument Audio
Calendars and Lists
Courtroom Seating
CASE DOCUMENTS
Docket Search
Orders of the Court
Orders by Circuit
Granted/Noted Cases List
Journal
NEWS MEDIA
Services for News Media
Press Releases
Media Advisories
Press Credentials
Speeches
A Reporter's Guide to Applications
Chief Justice's Year-End Reports on the Federal Judiciary
ABOUT
Justices
Supreme Court at Work
Code of Conduct for Justices
History and Traditions
The Supreme Court Building
Building Regulations
Frequently Asked Questions
VISIT
Hours & Directions
Prohibited Items
Visitor Guidelines
Accessibility
Maps & Guides
Courtroom Lectures
Exhibitions
Group Visits
Activities for Students & Families
Café & Building Amenities
Home
>
Search Results
Docket for 24-881
Search documents in this case:
Search
No. 24-881
Title:
Georgia Association of Club Executives, Inc., Petitioner
v.
Georgia, et al.
Docketed:
February 18, 2025
Lower Ct:
Supreme Court of Georgia
Case Numbers:
(S24A0726, S24A0772)
Decision Date:
October 31, 2024
Rehearing Denied:
November 14, 2024
Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Date
Proceedings and Orders
Feb 12 2025
Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due March 20, 2025)
Petition
Certificate of Word Count
Proof of Service
Mar 10 2025
Waiver of right of respondent Georgia, et al. to respond filed.
Main Document
Mar 12 2025
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/28/2025.
Mar 18 2025
Brief amici curiae of Foundation for Individual Rights and Expression, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main Document
Proof of Service
Certificate of Word Count
Mar 24 2025
Response Requested. (Due April 23, 2025)
Mar 28 2025
Motion to extend the time to file a response from April 23, 2025 to May 23, 2025, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Mar 31 2025
Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including May 23, 2025.
Apr 23 2025
Brief amici curiae of First Amendment Scholars filed.
Main Document
Proof of Service
Certificate of Word Count
Apr 23 2025
Brief amici curiae of Secular Pro-Life, et al. filed.
Main Document
Proof of Service
Certificate of Word Count
NAME
ADDRESS
PHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Alexander Volokh
Counsel of Record
Emory Law School
1301 Clifton Rd NE
Atlanta, GA 30322
volokh@post.harvard.edu
404-737-5225
Party name: Georgia Association of Club Executives, Inc.
Attorneys for Respondents
Stephen John Petrany
Counsel of Record
Georgia Department of Law
40 Capitol Square SW
Atlanta, GA 30334
SPETRANY@LAW.GA.GOV
404-458-3408
Party name: Georgia, et al.
Other
Thomas Carlton Arthur
Counsel of Record
Emory University School of Law
1301 Clifton Road
Atlanta, GA 30322
lawtca@emory.edu
404-727-5792
Party name: Secular Pro-Life, Progressive Anti-Abortion Uprising, and Law Professors
Christopher Julian Paolella
Counsel of Record
Reich and Paolella LLP
111 Broadway
Suite 2002
New York, NY 10006
cpaolella@reichpaolella.com
2128047090
Party name: First Amendment Scholars
Edward S. Rudofsky
Counsel of Record
Edward S. Rudofsky, P.C.
Edward S. Rudofsky, P.C.
5 Arrowwood Lane
Melville, NY 11747
ed@rudofskylaw.com
9179139697
Party name: First Amendment Lawyers Association & The Foundation for Individual Rights & Expression
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##