Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 24-875
RSS Feed Print Notify Me
Search documents in this case:
No. 24-875
Title:Lucas Sirois, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:February 14, 2025
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the First Circuit
   Case Numbers:(23-1723)
   Decision Date:October 15, 2024
   Rehearing Denied:November 14, 2024
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Feb 12 2025Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due March 17, 2025)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 04 2025Waiver of right of respondent United States to respond filed.
Main Document
Mar 12 2025DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/28/2025.
Mar 31 2025Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Sean Michael Aasen
    Counsel of Record
Porter, Wright, Morris & Arthur LLP
2020 K St NW
Suite 600
Washington, DC 20006

saasen@porterwright.com
3174966368
Party name: Lucas Sirois
Attorneys for Respondent
Sarah M. Harris
    Counsel of Record
Acting Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SUPREMECTBRIEFS@USDOJ.GOV
202-514-2217
Party name: United States

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543