Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 24-866
RSS Feed Print Notify MeSearch documents in this case:
No. 24-866
Title:Converter Manufacturing, LLC, Petitioner
v.
Tekni-Plex, Inc.
Docketed:February 13, 2025
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit
   Case Numbers:(2023-1801, 2023-1802, 2023-1803)
   Decision Date:September 9, 2024
   Rehearing Denied:November 12, 2024
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Feb 10 2025Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due March 17, 2025)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 03 2025Motion to extend the time to file a response from March 17, 2025 to April 16, 2025, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Mar 04 2025Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including April 16, 2025.
Apr 16 2025Brief of respondent Tekni-Plex, Inc. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Apr 30 2025Reply of petitioner Converter Manufacturing, LLC filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
May 06 2025DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/22/2025.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Joseph A. Farco
    Counsel of Record
Bochner PLLC
1040 Avenue of the Americas, 15th Floor
New York, NY 10018

jfarco@bochner.law
5164769822
Party name: Converter Manufacturing, LLC
Attorneys for Respondent
Diane Siegel Danoff
    Counsel of Record
Dechert LLP
2929 Arch Street
Philadelphia, PA 19104

diane.danoff@dechert.com
215-994-2179
Party name: Tekni-Plex, Inc.

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543