SEARCH TIPS
Search term too short
Invalid text in search term. Try again
ADVANCED SEARCH
DOCKET SEARCH
Search
Toggle navigation
OPINIONS
Opinions of the Court
Opinions Relating to Orders
In-Chambers Opinions
U. S. Reports
Online Sources Cited in Opinions
Media Files Cited in Opinions
Case Citation Finder
FILING & RULES
Electronic Filing
Rules and Guidance
Supreme Court Bar
ORAL ARGUMENTS
Argument Transcripts
Argument Audio
Calendars and Lists
Courtroom Seating
CASE DOCUMENTS
Docket Search
Orders of the Court
Orders by Circuit
Granted/Noted Cases List
Journal
NEWS MEDIA
Services for News Media
Press Releases
Media Advisories
Press Credentials
Speeches
A Reporter's Guide to Applications
Chief Justice's Year-End Reports on the Federal Judiciary
ABOUT
Justices
Supreme Court at Work
Code of Conduct for Justices
History and Traditions
The Supreme Court Building
Building Regulations
Frequently Asked Questions
VISIT
Hours & Directions
Prohibited Items
Visitor Guidelines
Accessibility
Maps & Guides
Courtroom Lectures
Exhibitions
Group Visits
Activities for Students & Families
Café & Building Amenities
Home
>
Search Results
Docket for 24-853
Search documents in this case:
Search
No. 24-853
Title:
Rory Douglas Wilson, Petitioner
v.
Idaho
Docketed:
February 11, 2025
Linked with 2
Lower Ct:
Court of Appeals of Idaho
Case Numbers:
(50802)
Decision Date:
June 25, 2024
Rehearing Denied:
Discretionary Court Decision Date:
October 8, 2024
Date
Proceedings and Orders
Dec 04 2024
Application (24A556) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from January 6, 2025 to February 5, 2025, submitted to Justice Kagan.
Main Document
Proof of Service
Dec 06 2024
Application (24A556) granted by Justice Kagan extending the time to file until February 5, 2025.
Feb 05 2025
Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due March 13, 2025)
Petition
Certificate of Word Count
Proof of Service
Feb 26 2025
Waiver of right of respondent Idaho to respond filed.
Main Document
Mar 05 2025
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/21/2025.
Mar 10 2025
Response Requested. (Due April 9, 2025)
Apr 09 2025
Brief amicus curiae of Thomas More Society filed.
Main Document
Proof of Service
Certificate of Word Count
Apr 09 2025
Brief amici curiae of First Amendment Clinic at Duke Law School, et al. filed.
Main Document
Certificate of Word Count
Proof of Service
Apr 09 2025
Brief amicus curiae of Protect the First Foundation filed.
Main Document
Proof of Service
Certificate of Word Count
Apr 09 2025
Brief of respondent Idaho in opposition filed.
Main Document
Certificate of Word Count
Proof of Service
Apr 18 2025
Reply of petitioner Rory Douglas Wilson filed.
Main Document
Proof of Service
Certificate of Word Count
Apr 23 2025
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/15/2025.
May 19 2025
Petition DENIED.
NAME
ADDRESS
PHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Judd Edward Stone II
Counsel of Record
Stone | Hilton PLLC
600 Congress Ave.
Suite 2350
Austin, TX 78701
judd@stonehilton.com
(737) 465-7248
Party name: Rory Douglas Wilson
Attorneys for Respondent
Alan Michael Hurst
Counsel of Record
Idaho Office of the Attorney General
700 W. Jefferson Street
Boise, ID 83720
alan.hurst@ag.idaho.gov
2083342400
Party name: Idaho
Kenneth K. Jorgensen
Off of Attny Gen - State of ID
Statehouse Room 210
P.O. Box 83720
Boise, ID 83720-0010
ken.jorgensen@ag.idaho.gov
208-334-2400
Party name: Idaho
Other
Thomas L. Brejcha
Counsel of Record
Thomas More Society
309 W. Washington Street
Suite 1250
Chicago, IL 60606
tbrejcha@thomasmoresociety.org
3127821680
Party name: Thomas More Society
Sarah Hutt Ludington
Counsel of Record
Duke First Amendment Clinic
210 Science Drive
Durham, NC 27708
ludington@law.duke.edu
(919) 613-7048
Party name: First Amendment Clinics at Duke, Cornell, and Southern Methodist Law Schools, Avi Adelman and William Oetjen
Gene Clayton Schaerr
Counsel of Record
Schaerr | Jaffe
1717 K Street NW, Suite 900
Washington, DC 20006
GSCHAERR@SCHAERR-JAFFE.COM
202-787-1060
Party name: Protect the First Foundation
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##