Docket for 24-836
|
Nov 13 2024 | Application (24A485) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from December 5, 2024 to February 3, 2025, submitted to The Chief Justice. | | Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service | Nov 21 2024 | Application (24A485) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until February 3, 2025. | | | Feb 03 2025 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due March 7, 2025) | | PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Feb 10 2025 | Waiver of right of respondent Google LLC to respond filed. | | Main Document | Feb 12 2025 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/28/2025. | | | Mar 03 2025 | Petition DENIED. | | |
|