Docket for 24-786
|
Jan 21 2025 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due February 24, 2025) | | PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Feb 13 2025 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from February 24, 2025 to March 26, 2025, submitted to The Clerk. | | Main Document | Feb 14 2025 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including March 26, 2025, for all respondents. | | | Mar 11 2025 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from March 26, 2025 to April 25, 2025, submitted to The Clerk. | | Main Document | Mar 13 2025 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including April 25, 2025, for all respondents. | | | Apr 25 2025 | Brief of respondent Pennsylvania Democratic Party in opposition filed. | | Main DocumentOtherCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Apr 25 2025 | Brief of respondents Faith Genser, et al. in opposition filed. | | Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count |
|