Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 24-768
RSS Feed Print Notify Me
Search documents in this case:
No. 24-768
Title:RADesign, Inc., et al., Petitioners
v.
Michael Grecco Productions, Inc.
Docketed:January 17, 2025
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit
   Case Numbers:(23-1078)
   Decision Date:August 16, 2024
   Rehearing Denied:October 17, 2024
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jan 15 2025Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due February 18, 2025)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 14 2025Brief amicus curiae of McHale & Slavin, P.A. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Feb 17 2025Waiver of right of respondent Michael Grecco Productions, Inc. to respond filed.
Main Document
Feb 18 2025Brief amici curiae of Indiana Pacers, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Feb 18 2025Brief amicus curiae of Professor Tyler Ochoa filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Feb 19 2025DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/7/2025.
Feb 24 2025Response Requested. (Due March 26, 2025)
Mar 10 2025Motion to extend the time to file a response from March 26, 2025 to April 25, 2025, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Mar 11 2025Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including April 25, 2025.
Mar 26 2025Brief amici curiae of American Apparel & Footwear Association, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 26 2025Brief amicus curiae of Klema Law, PL filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Apr 25 2025Brief of respondent Michael Grecco Productions, Inc. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
May 12 2025Reply of petitioners RADesign, Inc., et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
May 13 2025DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/29/2025.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Zachary D. Tripp
    Counsel of Record
Weil, Gotshal & Manges LLP
2001 M Street NW
Washington, DC 20036

ZACK.TRIPP@WEIL.COM
202-682-7220
Party name: RADesign, Inc., et al.
Attorneys for Respondent
Vincent Gregory Levy
    Counsel of Record
Holwell Shuster & Goldberg, LLP
425 Lexington Avenue
14th Floor
New York, NY 10017

VLEVY@HSGLLP.COM
646-837-5120
Party name: Michael Grecco Productions, Inc.
Bruce William BellinghamSpector Gadon Rosen Vinci, P.C.
1635 Market Street
7th Floor
Philadelphia, PA 19103

bbellingham@sgrvlaw.com
2152418916
Party name: Michael Grecco Productions, Inc.
Other
Kian James Hudson
    Counsel of Record
Barnes & Thornburg LLP
11 S Meridian St.
Indianapolis, IN 46204

kian.hudson@btlaw.com
3172293111
Party name: Indiana Pacers, Denver Nuggets, Minnesota Timberwolves, New Orleans Pelicans, Orlando Magic, Portland Trail Blazers, Sacramento Kings and San Antonio Spurs
Griffin Clayton Klema
    Counsel of Record
Klema Law, PL
420 W. Kennedy Blvd
Second Floor
Tampa, FL 33606

Griffin@KlemaLaw.com
202-713-5292
Party name: Klema Law, PL
Andrew David Lockton
    Counsel of Record
McHale & Slavin, P.A.
2855 PGA Boulevard
Palm Beach Gardens, FL 33410

alockton@mchaleslavin.com
561-625-6575
Party name: McHale & Slavin, P.A.
Tyler Trent Ochoa
    Counsel of Record
Santa Clara University School of Law
500 El Camino Real
Santa Clara, CA 95053

ttochoa@scu.edu
4085542765
Party name: Tyler T. Ochoa
John Paul O'Herron
    Counsel of Record
ThompsonMcMullan, P.C.
100 Shockoe Slip, Third Floor
Richmond, VA 23219

joherron@t-mlaw.com
8046497545
Party name: Amicus Curiae

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543