Docket for 24-759
 | | No. 24-759
| Title: | Wye Oak Technology, Inc., Petitioner v. Republic of Iraq, et al. | Docketed: | January 16, 2025 | | | Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the District of Columbia Circuit | Case Numbers: | (23-7009, 23-7013) | Decision Date: | July 16, 2024 | Rehearing Denied: | October 16, 2024 | Discretionary Court Decision Date: | | | | |
|
Jan 14 2025 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due February 18, 2025) | | PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Jan 29 2025 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from February 18, 2025 to March 20, 2025, submitted to The Clerk. | | Main DocumentProof of Service | Jan 30 2025 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including March 20, 2025. | | | Mar 20 2025 | Brief of respondents Republic of Iraq, et al. in opposition filed. | | Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | Apr 08 2025 | Reply of petitioner Wye Oak Technology, Inc. filed. (Distributed) | | Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | Apr 09 2025 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/25/2025. | | | Apr 28 2025 | The Solicitor General is invited to file a brief in this case expressing the views of the United States. Justice Jackson took no part in the consideration of this petition. See 28 U. S. C. §455 and Code of Conduct for Justices of the Supreme Court of the United States, Canon 3B(2)(e) (prior judicial service). | | |
|