Docket for 24-728
|
Oct 21 2024 | Application (24A400) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from November 4, 2024 to January 3, 2025, submitted to Justice Kagan. | | Main DocumentProof of Service | Oct 24 2024 | Application (24A400) granted by Justice Kagan extending the time to file until January 3, 2025. | | | Jan 03 2025 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due February 10, 2025) | | Petition | Jan 13 2025 | Waiver of right of respondents Rob Bonta, in His Official Capacity as Attorney General of California, Karen Ross, and Dr. Tomas Aragon to respond filed. | | Main Document | Jan 13 2025 | Waiver of right of respondents The Humane Society of the United States, et al. to respond filed. | | Main Document | Jan 29 2025 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/21/2025. | | | Jan 29 2025 | Brief amici curiae of Iowa, et al. filed. (Distributed) | | Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | Feb 06 2025 | Brief amici curiae of Phyllis Schlafly Eagles, et al. filed. (Distributed) | | Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | Feb 10 2025 | Response Requested. (Due March 12, 2025) | | | Feb 21 2025 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from March 12, 2025 to April 11, 2025, submitted to The Clerk. | | Main Document | Feb 24 2025 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including April 11, 2025, for all respondents. | | | Apr 11 2025 | Brief of respondents Rob Bonta, Attorney General of California, et al. in opposition filed. | | Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | Apr 11 2025 | Brief of respondents Humane World for Animals, et al. in opposition filed. | | Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | Apr 25 2025 | Reply of petitioner Iowa Pork Producers Association filed. | | Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | Apr 29 2025 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/15/2025. | | | May 19 2025 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/22/2025. | | |
|