Docket for 24-724
 | | No. 24-724
| Title: | The Hain Celestial Group, Inc., et al., Petitioners v. Sarah Palmquist, Individually and as Next Friend of E.P., a Minor, et al. | Docketed: | January 10, 2025 | Linked with 24A519 | | Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit | Case Numbers: | (23-40197) | Decision Date: | May 28, 2024 | Rehearing Denied: | September 9, 2024 | Discretionary Court Decision Date: | | | | Questions Presented |
|
Nov 22 2024 | Application (24A519) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from December 8, 2024 to January 8, 2025, submitted to Justice Alito. | | Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service | Nov 26 2024 | Application (24A519) granted by Justice Alito extending the time to file until January 7, 2025. | | | Jan 07 2025 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due February 10, 2025) | | PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Jan 29 2025 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from February 10, 2025 to March 12, 2025, submitted to The Clerk. | | Main Document | Jan 30 2025 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including March 12, 2025. | | | Feb 03 2025 | Brief amicus curiae of Atlantic Legal Foundation filed. | | Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | Feb 10 2025 | Brief amici curiae of National Association of Manufacturers, et al. filed. | | Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | Mar 12 2025 | Brief of respondents Sarah Palmquist, et al. in opposition filed. | | Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | Mar 25 2025 | Reply of petitioners The Hain Celestial Group, Inc., et al. filed. (Distributed) | | Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | Mar 26 2025 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/17/2025. | | | Apr 21 2025 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/25/2025. | | | Apr 28 2025 | Petition GRANTED limited to Question 1 presented by the petition. | | | May 08 2025 | Motion of The Hain Celestial Group, Inc., Whole Foods Market, Inc. for an extension of time submitted. | | Main Document |
|