Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 24-7123
RSS Feed Print Notify Me
Search documents in this case:
No. 24-7123
Title:Carlos Edward Thurman, Jr., Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:May 2, 2025
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Sixth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(24-5020)
   Decision Date:January 28, 2025
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Apr 28 2025Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due June 2, 2025)
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionAppendixAppendixOther
May 08 2025Waiver of right of respondent United States to respond filed.
Main Document
May 14 2025DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/29/2025.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Jarrod James Beck
    Counsel of Record
Law Office of Jarrod J. Beck, PLLC
101 West Short Street
Lexington, KY 40507

jarrod.beck@gmail.com
270-860-2025
Party name: Carlos Thurman
Attorneys for Respondent
D. John Sauer
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, D 20530-0001

SUPREMECTBRIEFS@USDOJ.GOV
202-514-2217
Party name: United States

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543