Docket for 24-712
 | | No. 24-712
| Title: | Daniel Peterson, Petitioner v. Minerva Surgical, Inc. | Docketed: | January 3, 2025 | | | Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit | Case Numbers: | (24-3003) | Decision Date: | August 15, 2024 | Rehearing Denied: | | Discretionary Court Decision Date: | | | | |
|
Nov 06 2024 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due February 3, 2025) | | Petition | Jan 22 2025 | Waiver of right of respondent Minerva Surgical to respond filed. | | Main Document | Jan 28 2025 | Brief amicus curiae of Lift Our Voices filed. (Distributed) | | Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Jan 29 2025 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/21/2025. | | | Feb 24 2025 | Petition DENIED. | | |
|