SEARCH TIPS
Search term too short
Invalid text in search term. Try again
ADVANCED SEARCH
DOCKET SEARCH
Search
Toggle navigation
OPINIONS
Opinions of the Court
Opinions Relating to Orders
In-Chambers Opinions
U. S. Reports
Online Sources Cited in Opinions
Media Files Cited in Opinions
Case Citation Finder
FILING & RULES
Electronic Filing
Rules and Guidance
Supreme Court Bar
ORAL ARGUMENTS
Argument Transcripts
Argument Audio
Calendars and Lists
Courtroom Seating
CASE DOCUMENTS
Docket Search
Orders of the Court
Orders by Circuit
Granted/Noted Cases List
Journal
NEWS MEDIA
Services for News Media
Press Releases
Media Advisories
Press Credentials
Speeches
A Reporter's Guide to Applications
Chief Justice's Year-End Reports on the Federal Judiciary
ABOUT
Justices
Supreme Court at Work
Code of Conduct for Justices
History and Traditions
The Supreme Court Building
Building Regulations
Frequently Asked Questions
VISIT
Hours & Directions
Prohibited Items
Visitor Guidelines
Accessibility
Maps & Guides
Courtroom Lectures
Exhibitions
Group Visits
Activities for Students & Families
Café & Building Amenities
Home
>
Search Results
Docket for 24-7075
Search documents in this case:
Search
No. 24-7075
Title:
Christopher E. Barnes, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:
April 25, 2025
Linked with 2
Lower Ct:
United States Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit
Case Numbers:
(23-13438)
Decision Date:
October 28, 2024
Rehearing Denied:
Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Date
Proceedings and Orders
Jan 10 2025
Application (24A691) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from January 26, 2025 to March 27, 2025, submitted to Justice Thomas.
Main Document
Lower Court Orders/Opinions
Other
Proof of Service
Jan 15 2025
Application (24A691) granted by Justice Thomas extending the time to file until February 25, 2025.
Feb 22 2025
Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due May 27, 2025)
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis
Petition
Appendix
Appendix
Proof of Service
May 08 2025
Waiver of right of respondent United States of America to respond filed.
Main Document
May 14 2025
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/29/2025.
NAME
ADDRESS
PHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Jonathan Dodson
Counsel of Record
Federal Defenders of the MDGA, Inc.
440 MLK, Jr. Blvd
Suite 400
Macon, GA 31201
jonathan_dodson@fd.org
4787434747
Party name: Christopher Barnes
Attorneys for Respondent
D. John Sauer
Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, D 20530-0001
SUPREMECTBRIEFS@USDOJ.GOV
202-514-2217
Party name: United States of America
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##