Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 24-7057
RSS Feed Print Notify Me
Search documents in this case:
No. 24-7057
Title:Earl B. Penn, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:April 22, 2025
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eighth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(23-1262)
   Decision Date:March 24, 2025
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Apr 17 2025Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due May 22, 2025)
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 14 2025Motion to extend the time to file a response from May 22, 2025 to June 23, 2025, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
May 15 2025Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including June 23, 2025.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Dan Phillip Goldberg
    Counsel of Record
Federal Public Defender
1000 Walnut, Suite 600
Kansas City, MO 64106

DAN_GOLDBERG@FD.ORG
816-471-8282
Party name: Earl Penn
Attorneys for Respondent
D. John Sauer
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, D 20530-0001

SUPREMECTBRIEFS@USDOJ.GOV
202-514-2217
Party name: United States

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543