Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 24-7053
RSS Feed Print Notify Me
Search documents in this case:
No. 24-7053
Title:Valente Brito, Jr., Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:April 22, 2025
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(24-50321)
   Decision Date:April 2, 2025
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Apr 16 2025Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due May 22, 2025)
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionAppendixProof of Service
May 08 2025Waiver of right of respondent United States of America to respond filed.
Main Document
May 14 2025DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/29/2025.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Gregory Don Sherwood
    Counsel of Record
P.O. Box 200613
Austin, TX 78720-0613

gsherwood@mail.com
512-484-9029
Party name: Valente Brito, Jr.
Attorneys for Respondent
D. John Sauer
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, D 20530-0001

SUPREMECTBRIEFS@USDOJ.GOV
202-514-2217
Party name: United States of America

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543