Docket for 24-7051
|
Apr 15 2025 | Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due May 22, 2025) | | Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionAppendixProof of Service | May 14 2025 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from May 22, 2025 to June 23, 2025, submitted to The Clerk. | | Main Document | May 15 2025 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including June 23, 2025. | | |
|