Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 24-7033
RSS Feed Print Notify Me
Search documents in this case:
No. 24-7033
Title:Aqudre Quailes, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:April 18, 2025
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Third Circuit
   Case Numbers:(23-2533)
   Decision Date:January 17, 2025
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Apr 14 2025Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due May 19, 2025)
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionAppendixProof of Service
May 14 2025Motion to extend the time to file a response from May 19, 2025 to June 18, 2025, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
May 15 2025Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including June 18, 2025.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Frederick William Ulrich
    Counsel of Record
Federal Public Defenders Office
100 Chestnut Street
3rd Floor
Harrisburg, PA 17101

FRITZ_ULRICH@FD.ORG
717-782-2237
Party name: Aqudre Quailes
Attorneys for Respondent
D. John Sauer
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, D 20530-0001

SUPREMECTBRIEFS@USDOJ.GOV
202-514-2217
Party name: United States

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543