Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 24-7011
RSS Feed Print Notify Me
Search documents in this case:
No. 24-7011
Title:Donald Turner, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:April 16, 2025
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the First Circuit
   Case Numbers:(23-1848, 23-1849)
   Decision Date:December 27, 2024
   Rehearing Denied:January 23, 2025
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Mar 31 2025Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due May 16, 2025)
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionAppendixProof of Service
Apr 21 2025Waiver of right of respondent United States to respond filed.
Main Document
Apr 24 2025DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/15/2025.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Vivian Shevitz
    Counsel of Record
Vivian Shevitz, Attorney at Law
322 E. Harrison Ave.
Unit 5
Royal Oak, MI 48067

vivian@shevitzlaw.com
914-763-2122
Party name: Donald Turner
Attorneys for Respondent
D. John Sauer
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, D 20530-0001

SUPREMECTBRIEFS@USDOJ.GOV
202-514-2217
Party name: United States

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543