Docket for 24-6996
|
Apr 08 2025 | Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due May 15, 2025) | | Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionAppendixProof of Service | May 07 2025 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from May 15, 2025 to June 16, 2025, submitted to The Clerk. | | Main Document | May 08 2025 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including June 16, 2025. | | |
|