Docket for 24-699
 | | No. 24-699
| Title: | Exxon Mobil Corporation, Petitioner v. Corporación Cimex, S.A. (Cuba), et al. | Docketed: | December 31, 2024 | Linked with 24A330 | | Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the District of Columbia Circuit | Case Numbers: | (21-7127, 22-7019, 22-7020) | Decision Date: | July 30, 2024 | Rehearing Denied: | | Discretionary Court Decision Date: | | | | |
|
Oct 03 2024 | Application (24A330) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from October 28, 2024 to December 27, 2024, submitted to The Chief Justice. | | Main DocumentProof of Service | Oct 10 2024 | Application (24A330) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until December 27, 2024. | | | Dec 27 2024 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due January 30, 2025) | | PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Jan 06 2025 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from January 30, 2025 to March 3, 2025, submitted to The Clerk. | | Main Document | Jan 07 2025 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including March 3, 2025. | | | Jan 30 2025 | Brief amici curiae of King Ranch Inc., et al. filed. | | Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | Jan 30 2025 | Brief amicus curiae of Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America filed. | | Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | Jan 31 2025 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from March 3, 2025 to April 2, 2025, submitted to The Clerk. | | Main Document | Feb 03 2025 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including April 2, 2025. | | | Apr 01 2025 | Brief of respondents Corporación CIMEX, S.A. (Cuba), et al. in opposition filed. | | Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | Apr 15 2025 | Reply of petitioner Exxon Mobil Corporation filed. (Distributed) | | Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Apr 16 2025 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/2/2025. | | | May 05 2025 | The Solicitor General is invited to file a brief in this case expressing the views of the United States. | | |
|