SEARCH TIPS
Search term too short
Invalid text in search term. Try again
ADVANCED SEARCH
DOCKET SEARCH
Search
Toggle navigation
OPINIONS
Opinions of the Court
Opinions Relating to Orders
In-Chambers Opinions
U. S. Reports
Online Sources Cited in Opinions
Media Files Cited in Opinions
Case Citation Finder
FILING & RULES
Electronic Filing
Rules and Guidance
Supreme Court Bar
ORAL ARGUMENTS
Argument Transcripts
Argument Audio
Calendars and Lists
Courtroom Seating
CASE DOCUMENTS
Docket Search
Orders of the Court
Orders by Circuit
Granted/Noted Cases List
Journal
NEWS MEDIA
Services for News Media
Press Releases
Media Advisories
Press Credentials
Speeches
A Reporter's Guide to Applications
Chief Justice's Year-End Reports on the Federal Judiciary
ABOUT
Justices
Supreme Court at Work
Code of Conduct for Justices
History and Traditions
The Supreme Court Building
Building Regulations
Frequently Asked Questions
VISIT
Hours & Directions
Prohibited Items
Visitor Guidelines
Accessibility
Maps & Guides
Courtroom Lectures
Exhibitions
Group Visits
Activities for Students & Families
Café & Building Amenities
Home
>
Search Results
Docket for 24-6932 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Search documents in this case:
Search
No. 24-6932 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Title:
Michael Tanzi, Petitioner
v.
Ricky D. Dixon, Secretary, Florida Department of Corrections
Docketed:
April 4, 2025
Linked with 24A948
Lower Ct:
Supreme Court of Florida
Case Numbers:
(SC2025-371)
Decision Date:
April 1, 2025
Rehearing Denied:
Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Date
Proceedings and Orders
Apr 04 2025
Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed.
Petition
Appendix
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis
Proof of Service
Apr 04 2025
Application (24A948) for a stay of execution of sentence of death, submitted to Justice Thomas.
Main Document
Apr 05 2025
Brief of Secretary, Department of Corrections in opposition submitted.
Main Document
Proof of Service
Apr 07 2025
Reply of petitioner Michael Tanzi filed.
Main Document
Proof of Service
Apr 07 2025
Reply of applicant Michael Tanzi filed.
Reply
Proof of Service
Apr 08 2025
Petition DENIED.
Apr 08 2025
Application (24A948) referred to the Court.
Apr 08 2025
Application (24A948) for stay of execution of sentence of death presented to Justice Thomas and by him referred to the Court is denied. The petition for a writ of certiorari is denied.
NAME
ADDRESS
PHONE
Attorneys for Respondent
Scott Andrew Browne
Counsel of Record
Office of the Attorney General
3507 E. Frontage Road, Suite 200
Tampa, FL 33607-7013
Scott.Browne@MyFloridaLegal.com
813-287-7910
Party name: Secretary, Department of Corrections
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##