Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 24-6892
RSS Feed Print Notify Me
Search documents in this case:
No. 24-6892
Title:Johnathan Anton Williams, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:March 31, 2025
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(23-13858)
   Decision Date:January 7, 2025
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Mar 26 2025Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due April 30, 2025)
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionAppendixProof of Service
Apr 18 2025Motion to extend the time to file a response from April 30, 2025 to May 30, 2025, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Apr 21 2025Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including May 30, 2025.
May 05 2025Memorandum of respondent United States filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Sonthonax Bolivar SaintGermain
    Counsel of Record
Sonthonax SaintGermain
201 South Orange Avenue
Suite 300
Orlando, FL 32801

sonthonax_saintgermain@fd.org
407-648-6338
Party name: Johnathan Anton Williams
Attorneys for Respondent
D. John Sauer
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SUPREMECTBRIEFS@USDOJ.GOV
202-514-2217
Party name: United States

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543