Docket for 24-685
|
Dec 23 2024 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due January 27, 2025) | | PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Jan 22 2025 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from January 27, 2025 to February 26, 2025, submitted to The Clerk. | | Main Document | Jan 23 2025 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including February 26, 2025. | | | Jan 27 2025 | Brief amicus curiae of American Association for Justice filed. | | Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | Feb 14 2025 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from February 26, 2025 to March 28, 2025, submitted to The Clerk. | | Main Document | Feb 18 2025 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including March 28, 2025. | | | Mar 28 2025 | Brief of respondent United States in opposition filed. | | Main DocumentProof of Service | Apr 15 2025 | Reply of petitioners Susan McBrine, et al. filed. (Distributed) | | Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | Apr 16 2025 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/2/2025. | | |
|