Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 24-6818
RSS Feed Print Notify Me
Search documents in this case:
No. 24-6818
Title:Matthew Ryan Hunt, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:March 20, 2025
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(22-4525)
   Decision Date:December 18, 2024
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Mar 17 2025Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due April 21, 2025)
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionAppendixProof of Service
Apr 18 2025Motion to extend the time to file a response from April 21, 2025 to May 21, 2025, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Apr 21 2025Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including May 21, 2025.
Apr 25 2025Memorandum of respondent United States filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
May 02 2025Reply of Matthew Hunt submitted.
Main Document

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Stephen James van Stempvoort
    Counsel of Record
Miller Johnson
45 Ottawa Avenue SW., Suite 1100
Grand Rapids, MI 49503

vanstempvoorts@millerjohnson.com
616-831-1765
Party name: Matthew Hunt
Attorneys for Respondent
D. John Sauer
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SUPREMECTBRIEFS@USDOJ.GOV
202-514-2217
Party name: United States of America

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543