Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 24-6813
RSS Feed Print Notify Me
Search documents in this case:
No. 24-6813
Title:Freddy Castro, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:March 20, 2025
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(24-10236)
   Decision Date:December 16, 2024
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Mar 17 2025Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due April 21, 2025)
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionAppendixProof of Service
Apr 14 2025Motion to extend the time to file a response from April 21, 2025 to May 31, 2025, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Apr 15 2025Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted in part and the time is extended to and including May 21, 2025.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Adam Ryan Nicholson
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Federal Public Defender
525 South Griffin Street, Suite 629
Dallas, TX 75202

ADAM_NICHOLSON@FD.ORG
214-767-2746
Party name: Freddy Castro
Attorneys for Respondent
D. John Sauer
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SUPREMECTBRIEFS@USDOJ.GOV
202-514-2217
Party name: United States

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543