Docket for 24-6804
|
Jan 10 2025 | Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due April 18, 2025) | | Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionAppendixProof of Service | Mar 31 2025 | Waiver of right of respondent Office of Personnel Management to respond filed. | | Main Document | Apr 02 2025 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/17/2025. | | | Apr 21 2025 | The motion of petitioner for leave to proceed in forma pauperis is denied. Petitioner is allowed until May 12, 2025, within which to pay the docketing fee required by Rule 38(a) and to submit a petition in compliance with Rule 33.1 of the Rules of this Court. | | |
|