SEARCH TIPS
Search term too short
Invalid text in search term. Try again
ADVANCED SEARCH
DOCKET SEARCH
Search
Toggle navigation
OPINIONS
Opinions of the Court
Opinions Relating to Orders
In-Chambers Opinions
U. S. Reports
Online Sources Cited in Opinions
Media Files Cited in Opinions
Case Citation Finder
FILING & RULES
Electronic Filing
Rules and Guidance
Supreme Court Bar
ORAL ARGUMENTS
Argument Transcripts
Argument Audio
Calendars and Lists
Courtroom Seating
CASE DOCUMENTS
Docket Search
Orders of the Court
Orders by Circuit
Granted/Noted Cases List
Journal
NEWS MEDIA
Services for News Media
Press Releases
Media Advisories
Press Credentials
Speeches
A Reporter's Guide to Applications
Chief Justice's Year-End Reports on the Federal Judiciary
ABOUT
Justices
Supreme Court at Work
Code of Conduct for Justices
History and Traditions
The Supreme Court Building
Building Regulations
Frequently Asked Questions
VISIT
Hours & Directions
Prohibited Items
Visitor Guidelines
Accessibility
Maps & Guides
Courtroom Lectures
Exhibitions
Group Visits
Activities for Students & Families
Café & Building Amenities
Home
>
Search Results
Docket for 24-6782
Search documents in this case:
Search
No. 24-6782
Title:
Aaron Christopher Lindsey, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:
March 17, 2025
Lower Ct:
United States Court of Appeals for the Eighth Circuit
Case Numbers:
(23-2871)
Decision Date:
December 16, 2024
Rehearing Denied:
Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Date
Proceedings and Orders
Mar 12 2025
Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due April 16, 2025)
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis
Petition
Appendix
Proof of Service
Apr 11 2025
Motion to extend the time to file a response from April 16, 2025 to May 16, 2025, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Apr 14 2025
Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including May 16, 2025.
Apr 25 2025
Memorandum of respondent United States filed.
Main Document
Proof of Service
May 05 2025
Reply of petitioner Aaron Christopher Lindsey filed.
Main Document
Proof of Service
NAME
ADDRESS
PHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Heather Rae Quick
Counsel of Record
Federal Public Defender Office - Iowa
222 Third Avenue SE
Suite 290
Cedar Rapids, IA 52401
HEATHER_QUICK@FD.ORG
319-363-9540
Party name: Aaron Christopher Lindsey
Attorneys for Respondent
D. John Sauer
Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001
SUPREMECTBRIEFS@USDOJ.GOV
202-514-2217
Party name: United States
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##