Docket for 24-6755
|
Mar 10 2025 | Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due April 11, 2025) | | Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionAppendixProof of Service | Apr 03 2025 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from April 11, 2025 to May 12, 2025, submitted to The Clerk. | | Main Document | Apr 04 2025 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including May 12, 2025. | | | Apr 11 2025 | Memorandum of respondent United States filed. | | Main DocumentProof of Service | Apr 30 2025 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/15/2025. | | |
|