SEARCH TIPS
Search term too short
Invalid text in search term. Try again
ADVANCED SEARCH
DOCKET SEARCH
Search
Toggle navigation
OPINIONS
Opinions of the Court
Opinions Relating to Orders
In-Chambers Opinions
U. S. Reports
Online Sources Cited in Opinions
Media Files Cited in Opinions
Case Citation Finder
FILING & RULES
Electronic Filing
Rules and Guidance
Supreme Court Bar
ORAL ARGUMENTS
Argument Transcripts
Argument Audio
Calendars and Lists
Courtroom Seating
CASE DOCUMENTS
Docket Search
Orders of the Court
Orders by Circuit
Granted/Noted Cases List
Journal
NEWS MEDIA
Services for News Media
Press Releases
Media Advisories
Press Credentials
Speeches
A Reporter's Guide to Applications
Chief Justice's Year-End Reports on the Federal Judiciary
ABOUT
Justices
Supreme Court at Work
Code of Conduct for Justices
History and Traditions
The Supreme Court Building
Building Regulations
Frequently Asked Questions
VISIT
Hours & Directions
Prohibited Items
Visitor Guidelines
Accessibility
Maps & Guides
Courtroom Lectures
Exhibitions
Group Visits
Activities for Students & Families
Café & Building Amenities
Home
>
Search Results
Docket for 24-6737
Search documents in this case:
Search
No. 24-6737
Title:
Carlsel Alexander, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:
March 11, 2025
Linked with 24A707
Lower Ct:
United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit
Case Numbers:
(23-30872)
Decision Date:
November 7, 2024
Rehearing Denied:
Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Date
Proceedings and Orders
Jan 15 2025
Application (24A707) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from February 5, 2025 to March 7, 2025, submitted to Justice Alito.
Main Document
Main Document
Main Document
Lower Court Orders/Opinions
Lower Court Orders/Opinions
Lower Court Orders/Opinions
Proof of Service
Jan 21 2025
Application (24A707) granted by Justice Alito extending the time to file until March 7, 2025.
Mar 07 2025
Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due April 10, 2025)
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis
Petition
Appendix
Appendix
Appendix
Certificate of Word Count
Proof of Service
Mar 18 2025
Waiver of right of respondent United States to respond filed.
Main Document
Mar 20 2025
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/4/2025.
Apr 07 2025
Petition DENIED.
NAME
ADDRESS
PHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Steven Edward Spires
Counsel of Record
Federal Public Defender, Eastern Dist. of La.
500 Poydras Street
Suite 318
New Orleans, LA 70130
steven_spires@fd.org
5045897933
Party name: Carlsel Alexander
Attorneys for Respondent
Sarah M. Harris
Counsel of Record
Acting Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001
SUPREMECTBRIEFS@USDOJ.GOV
202-514-2217
Party name: United States
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##