SEARCH TIPS
Search term too short
Invalid text in search term. Try again
ADVANCED SEARCH
DOCKET SEARCH
Search
Toggle navigation
OPINIONS
Opinions of the Court
Opinions Relating to Orders
In-Chambers Opinions
U. S. Reports
Online Sources Cited in Opinions
Media Files Cited in Opinions
Case Citation Finder
FILING & RULES
Electronic Filing
Rules and Guidance
Supreme Court Bar
ORAL ARGUMENTS
Argument Transcripts
Argument Audio
Calendars and Lists
Courtroom Seating
CASE DOCUMENTS
Docket Search
Orders of the Court
Orders by Circuit
Granted/Noted Cases List
Journal
NEWS MEDIA
Services for News Media
Press Releases
Media Advisories
Press Credentials
Speeches
A Reporter's Guide to Applications
Chief Justice's Year-End Reports on the Federal Judiciary
ABOUT
Justices
Supreme Court at Work
Code of Conduct for Justices
History and Traditions
The Supreme Court Building
Building Regulations
Frequently Asked Questions
VISIT
Hours & Directions
Prohibited Items
Visitor Guidelines
Accessibility
Maps & Guides
Courtroom Lectures
Exhibitions
Group Visits
Activities for Students & Families
Café & Building Amenities
Home
>
Search Results
Docket for 24-6517
Search documents in this case:
Search
No. 24-6517
Title:
Edell Jackson, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:
February 10, 2025
Lower Ct:
United States Court of Appeals for the Eighth Circuit
Case Numbers:
(22-2870)
Decision Date:
August 8, 2024
Rehearing Denied:
November 5, 2024
Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Date
Proceedings and Orders
Feb 03 2025
Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due March 12, 2025)
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis
Petition
Appendix
Proof of Service
Mar 05 2025
Motion to extend the time to file a response from March 12, 2025 to April 11, 2025, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Mar 06 2025
Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including April 11, 2025.
Apr 11 2025
Brief of respondent United States in opposition filed.
Main Document
Proof of Service
Apr 24 2025
Reply of Edell Jackson submitted.
Main Document
Proof of Service
NAME
ADDRESS
PHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Daniel L. Gerdts
Counsel of Record
Daniel L. Gerdts, Lawyer
331 Second Avenue South
Suite 705
Minneapolis, MN 55401
daniel@danielgerdtslaw.com
6128005086
Party name: Edell Jackson
Attorneys for Respondent
D. John Sauer
Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001
SUPREMECTBRIEFS@USDOJ.GOV
202-514-2217
Party name: United States
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##