SEARCH TIPS
Search term too short
Invalid text in search term. Try again
ADVANCED SEARCH
DOCKET SEARCH
Search
Toggle navigation
OPINIONS
Opinions of the Court
Opinions Relating to Orders
In-Chambers Opinions
U. S. Reports
Online Sources Cited in Opinions
Media Files Cited in Opinions
Case Citation Finder
FILING & RULES
Electronic Filing
Rules and Guidance
Supreme Court Bar
ORAL ARGUMENTS
Argument Transcripts
Argument Audio
Calendars and Lists
Courtroom Seating
CASE DOCUMENTS
Docket Search
Orders of the Court
Orders by Circuit
Granted/Noted Cases List
Journal
NEWS MEDIA
Services for News Media
Press Releases
Media Advisories
Press Credentials
Speeches
A Reporter's Guide to Applications
Chief Justice's Year-End Reports on the Federal Judiciary
ABOUT
Justices
Supreme Court at Work
Code of Conduct for Justices
History and Traditions
The Supreme Court Building
Building Regulations
Frequently Asked Questions
VISIT
Hours & Directions
Prohibited Items
Visitor Guidelines
Accessibility
Maps & Guides
Courtroom Lectures
Exhibitions
Group Visits
Activities for Students & Families
Café & Building Amenities
Home
>
Search Results
Docket for 24-6511
Search documents in this case:
Search
No. 24-6511
Title:
Ian Mitcham, Petitioner
v.
Arizona
Docketed:
February 10, 2025
Lower Ct:
Supreme Court of Arizona
Case Numbers:
(CR-23-0236-PR)
Decision Date:
December 17, 2024
Rehearing Denied:
Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Date
Proceedings and Orders
Feb 04 2025
Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due March 12, 2025)
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis
Petition
Appendix
Appendix
Proof of Service
Feb 13 2025
Waiver of right of respondent Arizona to respond filed.
Main Document
Feb 20 2025
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/7/2025.
Feb 24 2025
Response Requested. (Due March 26, 2025)
Mar 26 2025
Brief of respondent Arizona in opposition filed.
Main Document
Proof of Service
Certificate of Word Count
Apr 08 2025
Reply of petitioner Ian Mitcham filed. (Distributed)
Main Document
Proof of Service
Apr 10 2025
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/25/2025.
Apr 28 2025
Petition DENIED.
NAME
ADDRESS
PHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Mikel Patrick Steinfeld
Counsel of Record
Maricopa County Office of the Public Defender
620 W. Jackson, Suite 4015
Phoenix, AZ 85003
mikel.steinfeld@maricopa.gov
602-506-7711
Party name: Ian Mitcham
Attorneys for Respondent
Alice Mae Jones
Counsel of Record
Office of the Arizona Attorney General
2005 N. Central Avenue
Phoenix, AZ 85004
Alice.Jones@azag.gov
602-542-8587
Party name: State of Arizona
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##